Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST MARY, WARWICK
Charity number: 1128087

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAYNE ALISON MCHALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elisabeth Antrobus | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Joy Curtis | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Rachel Lucy Webber | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Brar | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gail Helen Guest | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Bartholomew | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Warren | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN LUXTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
GILL JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY RICHARD MAYELL KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DESMOND MICHAEL JACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN JOAN MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.