HEATHROW EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1130139
Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 179 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 179 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 December 2020 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 March 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 March 2017 35 days late Download