HEATHROW EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1130139
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £66.45k £56.36k £74.11k £59.57k £5.00k
Total expenditure £49.50k £18.40k £27.43k £37.27k £1.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A