DHANYAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1129618
Charity reporting is overdue by 1038 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2013 01/04/2014 01/04/2015 01/04/2016 01/04/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0