ALYMOS LTD

Charity number: 1128559
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 August 2020 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 05 August 2020 97 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 May 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 May 2019 16 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 06 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 06 April 2017 On time Download