ALYMOS LTD

Charity number: 1128559
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £48.55k £4.44k £200.00k £325.86k £263.15k
Total expenditure £23.51k £2.94k £1.70k £1.82k £5.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A