SHIPLEY MASJID ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1131121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required