SHIPLEY MASJID ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1131121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.67k £71.74k £48.62k £40.30k £38.55k
Total expenditure £21.69k £18.80k £15.59k £12.44k £7.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k