Financial history HOME - START RUNNYMEDE AND WOKING

Charity number: 1128932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £79.98k £126.77k £140.74k £90.62k £156.02k
Total expenditure £95.89k £96.50k £115.11k £96.03k £99.36k
Income from government contracts £57.70k £58.41k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k £7.50k £61.20k £54.40k £60.68k