JAAFRIYA ISLAMIC WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1129496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 December 2020 10 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 December 2019 03 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 23 December 2018 09 January 2020 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 23 December 2017 29 May 2019 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 23 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2016 Not Required