JAAFRIYA ISLAMIC WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1129496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 23/12/2016 23/12/2017 23/12/2018 23/12/2019 23/12/2020
Total gross income £9.67k £7.38k £16.91k £11.99k £9.90k
Total expenditure £9.97k £6.51k £15.65k £10.12k £6.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A