Accounts and annual returns HOUR OF SOLUTION MINISTRY

Charity number: 1129339
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 April 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required