Financial history HOUR OF SOLUTION MINISTRY

Charity number: 1129339
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.11k £8.04k £6.80k £5.58k £16.37k
Total expenditure £9.38k £6.26k £7.18k £5.15k £7.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A