RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT

Charity number: 1134387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33 £27 £0 £1.58k £930.49k
Total expenditure £250 £350 £300 £300 £637.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £140.63k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.13k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.67k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £533.12k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £362.57k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £616.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.30k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0