THE LONDON REGIMENT WELFARE AND BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1130304
Charity reporting is overdue by 597 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £24.71k £22.58k £7.59k £6.95k £8.70k
Total expenditure £4.28k £9.59k £990 £2.01k £9.96k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A