LONDON CONTEMPORARY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1129768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 January 2020 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 January 2020 187 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 01 July 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download