JUST WORLD PARTNERSHIPS

Charity number: 1136425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/12/2015 30/12/2016 30/12/2017 30/12/2018 30/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £12.48k
Total expenditure £6.00k £300 £0 £12.82k £269
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A