CANOLFAN MAERDY

Charity number: 1131506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 07/12/2016 07/12/2017 07/12/2018 07/12/2019 07/12/2020
Total gross income £239.55k £268.74k £292.39k £329.91k £449.67k
Total expenditure £256.02k £278.07k £294.64k £315.09k £295.08k
Income from government contracts £13.54k £25.00k £35.60k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £17.50k £19.23k £42.26k £210.91k