Accounts and annual returns NORTH WEST LEGAL SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1131259
Charity reporting is overdue by 1820 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 724 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 724 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1089 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1089 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1454 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1454 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1820 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1820 days