INSTITUTE OF JAINOLOGY LIMITED

Charity number: 1131173
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 04 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 26 June 2017 On time Download