INSTITUTE OF JAINOLOGY LIMITED

Charity number: 1131173
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £54.40k £32.28k £48.06k £60.56k £8.71k
Total expenditure £16.74k £15.09k £21.75k £34.27k £14.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A