Trustees WREXHAM AFC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1130924
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Humphrey Ker Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Niamh Mary Nora Kelly Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Robert John Stock Trustee 14 August 2019
None on record
John Andrew Harris Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Gavin Jones Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record
ANTHONY LEWIS Trustee 19 June 2012
CABLE SERVICES GROUP CHARITY
Overdue by 605 days
ALAN WATKIN Trustee 02 February 2012
THEATR CLWYD TRUST LTD
Received: On time
THE SYCHDYN MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Received: On time
GEORGE POWELL Trustee 02 February 2012
None on record
JONATHAN MILLER Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record