Accounts and annual returns DATUM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1133666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 January 2021 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 November 2019 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 November 2019 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window