Financial history DATUM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1133666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £53.88k £42.41k £32.45k £44.91k £15.68k
Total expenditure £55.39k £47.66k £52.30k £57.93k £13.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A