THE FOOTBALL LEAGUE (COMMUNITY) LIMITED

Charity number: 1132689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £17.90m £18.07m £18.61m £20.09m £18.57m
Total expenditure £17.43m £17.46m £18.45m £18.27m £19.34m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £12.18m £14.76m £11.91m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £270.00k £128.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.52m £2.95m £2.94m £4.81m £5.13m
Income - Other trading activities £442.00k £779.08k £806.97k £586.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £14.93m £14.33m £14.85m £14.68m £13.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.66k £7.62k £9.63k £10.43k £16.56k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.05m £16.75m £17.68m £17.72m £19.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £373.49k £706.10k £766.69k £557.31k £2.82k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £19.72k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0