Trustees THE FOOTBALL LEAGUE (COMMUNITY) LIMITED
Charity number: 1132689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam Scully | Chair | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dave Palmer | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Uma Cresswell | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Shanahan | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Birch | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Gear | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Davidson | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Godfery Williamson OBE | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emily Jane Hill | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Perchard | Trustee | 14 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.