Trustees The Arts Society Southwold

Charity number: 1132568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Ann Kent Chair 10 January 2017
None on record
Lady Mary Prudence Bannerman Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Jennifer Allen Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
CAROL MCKELVIE SCRIVEN Trustee 13 January 2013
None on record
DAVID ROBERT GOODMAN Trustee 13 January 2013
None on record
CAROLYN GREER WALKER Trustee 05 November 2012
None on record
RICHARD CRAWLEY WOOD Trustee
SOUTHWOLD (SOLE BAY) LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH MARGARET DALES Trustee
None on record