Financial history THE HELIANTHUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1130451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £82.89k £59.38k £77.26k £53.04k £58.71k
Total expenditure £69.92k £90.22k £105.13k £61.87k £53.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A