ETHICAL GIVING

Charity number: 1131343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £104.40k £45.68k £101.02k £130.53k £49.89k
Total expenditure £113.08k £40.10k £101.04k £115.01k £72.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A