Accounts and annual returns ANGLIA IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1134478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 December 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 November 2020 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required