BLACKWATER VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1131981
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.90k £9.74k £14.94k £60.46k £14.52k
Total expenditure £5.23k £4.59k £9.69k £56.17k £14.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £350 £43.91k £3.66k