20 STORIES HIGH

Charity number: 1137255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £301.20k £467.95k £448.13k £475.02k £456.11k
Total expenditure £271.25k £443.76k £431.48k £496.18k £451.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.25k £19.25k £19.25k £266.76k £17.71k