Financial history AL MADINA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1136277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £1.27k £1.97k £4.81k £2.11k £2.03k
Total expenditure £829 £2.71k £4.87k £1.28k £2.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A