ALL DOGS MATTER

Charity number: 1132883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £152.31k £252.00k £286.24k £307.11k £298.89k
Total expenditure £125.59k £230.16k £253.90k £284.73k £244.21k
Income from government contracts £11.73k £9.10k £14.96k £9.35k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A