ALL DOGS MATTER

Charity number: 1132883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Kerr Mr Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
Susanna Russell Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
Raphael Harris Trustee 31 August 2018
HOME-START BARNET Received: On time
Wendy Miles Trustee 02 February 2015 None on record
Michael Testler Chair 22 February 2015 None on record
Sarah Furminger Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
PETER JOSEPH EGAN Trustee
THE ANTHONY V MARTIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time