AL ANSAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1132684
Charity reporting is overdue by 120 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 December 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 04 December 2020 127 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 January 2020 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 31 January 2020 185 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required