SOUTHERN MARCHES AREA QUAKER MEETING

Charity number: 1134528
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 January 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 January 2018 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)