SOUTHERN MARCHES AREA QUAKER MEETING

Charity number: 1134528
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £142.64k £174.32k £157.65k £128.49k £205.06k
Total expenditure £123.24k £121.57k £155.33k £156.81k £260.72k