2ND BROOKLANDS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1132709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 March 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 December 2017 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required