PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CHURCH, BURWASH

Charity number: 1133028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £84.99k £84.15k £113.15k £93.97k £179.54k
Total expenditure £76.50k £77.31k £81.45k £95.38k £207.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.25k £1.16k £1.10k £1.25k £1.50k