PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CHURCH, BURWASH

Charity number: 1133028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Magnus Schofield Trustee 02 September 2020 None on record
VICTORIA MARGARET PATTERSON Trustee 26 April 2015
THE REVEREND GEORGE BARNSLEY'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHARLES FREDERICK PETER MERCHANT Trustee 30 December 2012 None on record
Maureen Christine Jenner Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
JOANNE ELIZABETH BROWN Trustee 22 April 2018
FRIENDS OF BURWASH SCHOOLS Received: On time
THE REVEREND GEORGE BARNSLEY'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
Sara Jane Stonor Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Mary Elizabeth Westhead Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Richard Charles Harden Trustee 02 September 2020
THE REVEREND GEORGE BARNSLEY'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
David Dunham Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Celia Margaret Merchant Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Hilary Elizabeth Stewart Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
SHIRLEY ANN VINEY Trustee 24 April 2016
BURWASH VILLAGE HALL Received: 3 days late
BURWASH VILLAGE HALL CENTENARY PERMANENT ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
Gary Noel Churchill Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
MR CHRIS WOODBURN Trustee
THE BARKSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS CHURCH BURWASH Received: On time
Rachel Anne Thomson Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record