Financial history YMCA THAMES GATEWAY

Charity number: 1133269
Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.59m £5.66m £6.33m £6.51m £8.22m
Total expenditure £5.55m £5.50m £6.50m £6.88m £7.05m
Income from government contracts £151.24k £202.32k £467.52k £553.61k £642.61k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £21.02k £47.86k £120.43k £58.43k £129.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.49m £5.53m £6.10m £6.02m £6.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £75.06k £79.98k £60.07k £90.11k £44.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £50.77k £342.06k £1.52m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.51m £3.81m £6.43m £6.79m £6.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.45k £55.90k £72.86k £84.41k £89.43k
Expenditure - Governance £36.96k £85.20k £46.97k £37.63k £53.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.21k £5.42k £5.57k £0 £5.29k
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.63m £0 £0 £0