Financial history WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION

Charity number: 1137321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.32m £1.21m £997.49k £573.80k £506.69k
Total expenditure £1.22m £683.99k £892.21k £741.56k £656.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £1.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £940.88k £773.54k £238.63k £206.79k £208.89k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £53.67k £52.05k £45.75k £30.63k £16.64k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.28m £379.41k £711.58k £320.03k £281.17k
Income - Other £36.50k £1.37k £1.52k £16.36k £0
Income - Legacies £594.73k £522.14k £10.31k £23 £11.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £826.33k £597.81k £808.43k £704.95k £625.11k
Expenditure - Raising funds £391.45k £86.18k £83.78k £36.61k £31.53k
Expenditure - Governance £6.65k £6.43k £6.55k £6.80k £7.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £27.53k £31.65k £30.86k £26.87k £26.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0