Trustees WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION

Charity number: 1137321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Udo Oleforo Trustee 17 October 2021
None on record
Ruth Lythe Trustee 17 October 2021
None on record
Sylvester Mbeah Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Louis Colley Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Welbeck Achiampong Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
Louise Sarah Jean Harding-Murray Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Dr Trustee 01 September 2019
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Steven Robert McKay Cooper Trustee 01 September 2019
ISLINGTON FAITHS FORUM
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Barnabas Masukume Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
Joshua Snape Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
Stephen Ludlow Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
Sagan Daniels Trustee 21 October 2018
None on record
Rev Jennifer Hunter Smith Trustee 01 September 2017
THE WHITECHAPEL MISSION
Received: On time
Ebenezer Jojo Annan Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
KOFI AGBOLEGBE Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Cheryl Gurnham Trustee 01 July 2016
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
THE WHITECHAPEL MISSION
Received: On time
Betty Maynard Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Kingsley Kissi Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
PETER FORWARD Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Gavin Sutter Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Jerry Abankwah Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
John Offeh Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Samuel Appiah-Anderson Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record