Financial history KINGDOM OF GOD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL AND MOUNT CARMEL PRAYER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1137305
Charity reporting is overdue by 539 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £113.88k £98.71k £98.91k £115.33k £63.15k
Total expenditure £112.45k £100.32k £99.58k £117.22k £51.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A