Financial history THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND

Charity number: 1134193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £33.80k £40.92k £42.12k £44.66k £45.65k
Total expenditure £15.39k £15.89k £10.12k £37.97k £31.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A