Trustees THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND

Charity number: 1134193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS SUE TRUEFITT Chair 19 June 2013
FRIENDS OF ST. LAURENCE'S SCALBY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, SCALBY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF CHRISTOPHER KELD
Received: On time
The Venerable Amanda Bloor Trustee 15 June 2020
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND
Received: On time
THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
John Longbottom Trustee 14 May 2020
None on record
THE VEN SAM RUSHTON Trustee 06 May 2015
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND
Received: On time
THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
UNIVERSITY OF YORK CHAPLAINCY CENTRE
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL SERVICES
Received: On time
THE VEN ANDY BROOM Trustee 06 October 2014
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND
Received: On time
THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
CHARITY OF EMILY WILSON-BARKWORTH FOR POOR BENEFICED CLERGY OF THE CHURCH
Received: On time
ANN WATSON'S TRUST
Received: On time
CANON PETER JOHN WARRY Trustee
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND
Received: On time
UNIVERSITY OF YORK CHAPLAINCY CENTRE
Received: On time
ACTS 435
Received: On time
MELVYN ALAN GRIGGS Trustee
None on record