Financial history ST MARY WITH ST PAUL TRUST AT PENZANCE CORNWALL

Charity number: 1133891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £71.64k £33.20k £93.89k £131.23k £152.57k
Total expenditure £86.71k £40.12k £89.92k £130.16k £164.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A