THE KNIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 March 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 June 2019 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 June 2019 126 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 September 2017 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required