ANIMAL WELFARE AND RESCUE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1136726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/12/2019
Total gross income £19.50k £8.85k £9.69k £6.30k £8.50k
Total expenditure £10.00k £6.00k £8.44k £4.90k £7.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A